Council | 02/23/2024 | Law L25-0122, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001847 | ||
Council | 01/03/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 12/29/2023 | Act A25-0330 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016570 | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 12/21/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0330 | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Amendment (McDuffie) | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0126 | ||
Council | 10/16/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/28/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/24/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0126 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 02/08/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |