Council | 09/29/2023 | Law L25-0044, Effective from Aug 24, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012877 | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Act A25-0159 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009695 | ||
Council | 07/13/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0159 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/01/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 03/28/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0138 | ||
Council | 03/27/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 02/24/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0138 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment | ||
Council | 02/15/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |