Council | 03/31/2023 | Act A25-0058 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003813, Expires on Jun 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0058, Expires on Jun 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/15/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | CM McDuffie Amendment | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/23/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |