District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0147 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/07/2023

                             	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
________________ 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act To provide for regulation of certain insurance rates in 
the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, to change the motor vehicle and 
homeowner insurance rate filing standard from “file-and- use” to require prior approval 
with a 90- day review period, to provide notice and an opportunity for a hearing before a 
rate filing is determined to be excessive or unfairly discriminatory; and	, beginning on 
September 1, 2023, to require insurers to provide policyholders 60-	day advance written 
notice of any rate increase of 10% or more. 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Motor Vehicle and Homeowner Insurance Prior Approval Rate Filing 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”	. 
 
Sec. 2. An Act To provide for regulation of certain insurance rates in the District of 
Columbia, and for other purposes, approved May 20, 1948 (62 Stat. 243; D.C. Official Code § 
31-2701 et seq.), is amended follows:  
 (a) Section 3(f)(2) (D.C. Official Code § 31-	2703(f)(2)) is amended to read as follows: 
 “(2)(A)(i) Each final rate or premium charge proposed to be used by any motor 
vehicle or homeowner insurer shall be filed with the Commissioner and shall be adequate, not 
excessive, and not unfairly discriminatory. Before 	a motor vehicle or homeowner rate or 
premium charge filing shall become effective, the Commissioner shall have the authority to 
determine within 90 days after the filing date that 	a rate or premium charge is excessive if the 
rate or premium charge is unreasonably high for the insurance provided and is not actuarially 
justified based on commonly accepted actuarial principles.  
 “(ii) In determining whether a rate compl	ies with the standards set forth in 
sub-subparagraph (i) of this subparagraph, due consideration shall be given to past and 
prospective loss experience within and outside the District, a reasonable margin for underwriting 
profit and contingencies, dividends, savings, or unabsorbed premium deposits allowed or 
returned by insurers to their policyholders or members or subscribers, past and prospective 
expenses, both nationwide and in the District, and investment income earned or realized by 
insurers both from their unearned premiums and from their loss reserve funds.   	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
“(B)(i) If the Commissioner does not make a determination on a proposed 
rate or premium charge within the 90- day review period, the rate or premium charge shall be 
deemed approved.   
 “(ii) If the Commissioner determines, within the 9	0-day review 
period, that a motor vehicle or homeowner rate or premium charge may be 	excessive or unfairly 
discriminatory, the Commissioner shall provide the insurer with notice of the determination, the 
reasons for the de termination, and an opportunity for a hearing.  
 “(iii) An insurer must request a hearing within 15 days after the 
notice is provided to the insurer by the Commissioner.   
 “(iv)(I) The Commissioner shall hold a hearing within 60 days 
after a written request is timely received from the insurer	, and the Commissioner shall issue a 
final order within 30 days after the close of the hearing record.  
 “(II) The cost of the hearing shall be borne by the insurer 
requesting the rate increase.  
 “(v) If the Commissioner finds after a hearing that a rate or 
premium charge is not in compliance with this paragraph	, the Commissioner shall order that its 
use be discontinued for any policy issued or renewed after a date specified in the order and the 
order may prospectively provide for a rate 	premium charge adjustment of any policy then in 
force. 
“(C)(i) Beginning on September 1, 2023, if a final rate or premium charge 
to be implemented by an insurer will increase the existing rate or premium charge of a 
policyholder by 10% or more , the insurer shall provide the policyholder written notice of the 
percentage and amount of the increase as it pertains to the individual policyholder at least 60 
days, and not more than 90 days, before the increase will be applied to the policyholder’s 
insurance policy. 
 “(ii) If the insurer is unable to provide written notice at least 60 
days before the end of the current term of the policyholder’s policy, then the insurer must wait 
until the end of the subsequent term of the policyholder’s policy to implement the rate or 
premium increase.”. 
 (b) Section 4(c)(2)(A)(ii) (D.C. Official Code § 31	-2704(c)(2)(A)(ii)) is amended to read 
as follows: 
“(ii) The order is made after the prescribed investigation and 
hearing and within 30 days after the filing of rates affected, except as otherwise permitted by 
section 3(f)(2).” . 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
   	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in  
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia