Council | 08/02/2024 | Law L25-0190, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009563 | ||
Council | 06/07/2024 | Act A25-0478 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006693 | ||
Council | 06/05/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 05/30/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/29/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0478 | ||
Council | 05/21/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/28/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 03/18/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0151 | ||
Council | 03/12/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/12/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 03/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0151 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 02/23/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |