Council | 07/28/2023 | Law L25-0028, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010346 | ||
Council | 06/05/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 06/02/2023 | Act A25-0103 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007914 | ||
Council | 05/25/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0103 | ||
Council | 05/11/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/05/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/21/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0154 | ||
Council | 03/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0154 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 02/28/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |