Council | 03/31/2023 | Act A25-0059 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003816, Expires on Jun 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0059, Expires on Jun 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/13/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 03/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |