District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0159 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+_______________________________ 1
2+Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
3+ 3
4+ 4
5+A BILL 5
6+________ 6
7+ 7
8+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8
9+______________________ 9
10+ 10
11+To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on 11
12+applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, certificates of assurance associated with 12
13+District rent stabilization laws . 13
14+ 14
15+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 15
16+be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 16
17+2023”. 17
18+Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6- 10; D.C. 18
19+Official Code § 42- 3501.01 et seq .)), is amended by adding a new section 221a to read as 19
20+follows: 20
21+ “Sec. 221a. Certificate of assurance moratorium. 21
22+ “Notwithstanding the requirements of section 221, beginning on November 4, 2020, no 22
23+owner of a housing accommodation shall request a certificate of assurance, and the Mayor shall 23
24+not issue a certificate of assurance for any request received .”. 24
25+Sec. 3. Applicability. 25
26+This act shall apply as of November 4, 2020. 26
27+Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 27
28+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 28
29+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 29
30+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 30 2
231
3-
4-
5-1
6-
7-
8-AN ACT
9-
10-_______________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-______________________
15-
16-To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on
17-applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance of, certificates of assurance associated with
18-District rent stabilization laws .
19-
20-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may
21-be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Extension Emergency Amendment Act of
22-2023”.
23-
24-Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6- 10; D.C.
25-Official Code § 42- 3501.01 et seq .)), is amended by adding a new section 221a to read as
26-follows:
27- “Sec. 221a. Certificate of assurance moratorium.
28- “Notwithstanding the requirements of section 221, beginning on November 2, 2020, no
29-owner of a housing accommodation shall request a certificate of assurance, and the Mayor shall
30-not issue a certificate of assurance for any request received.”.
31-
32-Sec. 3. Applicability.
33- This act shall apply as of November 2, 2020.
34-
35-Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
36-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
37-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
38-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a).
39-
40-Sec. 5. Effective date.
41-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
42-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
43-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
44-
45- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
46-
47-
48-
49-2
50-
51-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
52-D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)).
53-
54-
55-______________________________
56-Chairman
57-Council of the District of Columbia
58-
59-
60-
61-
62-
63-_________________________________
64-Mayor
65-District of Columbia
66-
32+Sec. 5. Effective date. 31
33+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 32
34+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 33
35+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 34
36+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 35
37+D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 36