Council | 10/04/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Recreation and Community Affairs | ||
Council | 11/15/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/27/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/24/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/24/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0199 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs | ||
Council | 03/15/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |