Council | 07/28/2023 | Law L25-0030, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010348, Expires on Mar 01, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/05/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 06/02/2023 | Act A25-0106 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007922 | ||
Council | 05/25/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0106 | ||
Council | 05/11/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/07/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0208 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/31/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |