District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0208 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/02/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
____________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Act of 
2016 to extend the completion date for rehabilitation of houses in Historic Anacostia. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 2 of the Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Act of 2016, 
effective March 11, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-223; 64 DCR 182), is amended as follows: 
 (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “2000 P Street, N.W., Suite 320, 
Washington, D.C. 20036” and inserting the phrase “1307 New Hampshire Avenue, NW, Suite 
400, Washington, DC 20036”.  
(b) Subsection (b) is amended by striking the phrase “5 years” and inserting the phrase 
“10 years” in its place.   
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability.  
 This act shall apply as of March 15, 2023. 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   
 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 
(a)   This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of 
veto by the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional 
review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved  
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
 
 
 
 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the 
District of Columbia Register.  
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia