Council | 03/15/2024 | Law L25-0139, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002691 | ||
Council | 01/22/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 01/19/2024 | Act A25-0368 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000879 | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0368 | ||
Council | 12/28/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/30/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/28/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0218 | ||
Council | 11/24/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/12/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/06/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/29/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/07/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0218 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services | ||
Council | 03/16/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |