Council | 04/28/2023 | Act A25-0080 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006139, Expires on Jul 23, 2023 | ||
Council | 04/25/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0080, Expires on Jul 23, 2023 | ||
Council | 04/10/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/29/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |