District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0239 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
1+March 29, 2023
2+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
3+I urge you to take prompt and favorable action regarding this legislation.
4+:rMuri ;1 Bo
5+The legislation will approve multiyear Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. to
6+provide body-worn camera systems and accessories. The proposed contract is in the not-to-
7+exceed amount of $3,280,680 for the period of September 28, 2022 through September 27, 2026.
8+As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this contract. In
9+order
10+ to facilitate a response to any questions, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief
11+Operating Officer at the Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759.
12+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
13+Chairman
14+Council of the District of Columbia
15+John A. Wilson Building
16+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504
17+Washington, DC 20004
18+Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed
19+emergency legislation, the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and
20+Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”, along with the accompanying emergency
21+declaration resolution.
22+MURIEL BOWSER
23+MAYOR
24+Sincltely, A BILL
25+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
26+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
27+act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and19
28+20
29+21
30+December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the22
31+requirements of section 202(a) of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective Apiil
32+23
33+8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02(a)), the Council approves Contract
34+24
35+No. CW101347 to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories in the not-to exceed25
36+amount of $3,280,680 for goods and services received and to be received under the contract.
37+26
38+Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.27
39+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal
40+28
41+29
42+30
43+See. 4. Effective date.31
644 1
7-AN ACT
8-
9-___________
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-__________________
14-
15-
45+1
46+2
47+3
48+4
49+5
50+6
51+7
52+8
53+9
54+10
55+11
56+12
57+13
58+14
59+15
60+16
61+17
62+18
1663 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise,
1764 Inc. to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories.
18-
19- BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
20-act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and
2165 Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023.”
22-
2366 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
24-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the
25-requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8,
26-2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No.
27-CW101347 to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories in the not-to exceed amount
28-of $3,280,680 for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract.
29-
30- Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
31- The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal
3267 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
3368 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
34-
35-Sec. 4. Effective date.
36-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
37-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
38-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
39-
40-
41-
42-
43-
44-
45-
46- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
69+Chairman Phil Mendelson
70+at
71+ the request of the Mayor This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the32
72+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than33
73+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section34
74+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;35
75+D.C. Official Code § l-204.12(a)).36
5176 2
52-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
53-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
54-
55-
56-
57-______________________________
58-Chairman
59-Council of the District of Columbia
60-
61-
62-
63-
64-
65-_________________________________
66-Mayor
67-District of Columbia
68-
69-
70-