District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0239 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

                    March 29, 2023
Dear Chairman Mendelson:
I urge you to take prompt and favorable action regarding this legislation.
:rMuri ;1 Bo
The legislation will approve multiyear Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. to 
provide body-worn camera systems and accessories. The proposed contract is in the not-to- 
exceed amount of $3,280,680 for the period of September 28, 2022 through September 27, 2026.
As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this contract. In 
order
 to facilitate a response to any questions, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief 
Operating Officer at the Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759.
The Honorable Phil Mendelson
Chairman
Council of the District of Columbia
John A. Wilson Building
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed 
emergency legislation, the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and 
Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”, along with the accompanying emergency 
declaration resolution.
MURIEL BOWSER
MAYOR
Sincltely,   A BILL
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and19
20
21
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the22
requirements of section 202(a) of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective Apiil
23
8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02(a)), the Council approves Contract
24
No. CW101347 to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories in the not-to exceed25
amount of $3,280,680 for goods and services received and to be received under the contract.
26
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.27
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal
28
29
30
See. 4. Effective date.31
1
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, 
Inc. to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories.
Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023.”
Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at
 the request of the Mayor  This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the32
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than33
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section34
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;35
D.C. Official Code § l-204.12(a)).36
2