Council | 06/02/2023 | Act A25-0111 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007936, Expires on Aug 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 05/25/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0111, Expires on Aug 22, 2023 | ||
Council | 05/11/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Oral Amendment (Mendelson) | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 04/27/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |