8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
| 3 | + | _______________________________ _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Brianne Nadeau Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | A BILL 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | _________ 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | __________________ 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | 1978 to make certain multifamily residential structures eligible for historic homeowner 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | grants. 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | act may be cited as the “Targeted Historic Preservation Assistance Emergency Amendment Act 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | of 2023”. 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | Sec. 2. Section 11b of the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | 1978, effective March 2, 2007 (D.C. Law 16- 189; D.C. Official Code § 6- 1110.02), is amended 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | by adding a new subsection (g- 1) to read as follows: 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | “(g-1)(1) A grant may be made to a qualified taxpayer under subsection (e)(1) of this 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | section who owns a unit in a multifamily common interest community, as defined in section 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | 2232(3) of the Common Interest Community Repairs Amendment Act of 2018, effective October 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | 30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22- 168, D.C. Official Code § 42- 2071(3)) (“Common Interest Community 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | Repairs Amendment Act”), located in Square 2594, for the cost of rehabilitation by the common 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | interest community attributable to the taxpayer. 34 2 |
---|
10 | | - | _________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | __________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of |
---|
18 | | - | 1978 to make certain multifamily residential structures eligible for historic homeowner |
---|
19 | | - | grants. |
---|
20 | | - | |
---|
21 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
22 | | - | act may be cited as the “Targeted Historic Preservation Assistance Emergency Amendment Act |
---|
23 | | - | of 2023”. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 11b of the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of |
---|
26 | | - | 1978, effective March 2, 2007 (D.C. Law 16-189; D.C. Official Code § 6-1110.02), is amended |
---|
27 | | - | by adding a new subsection (g-1) to read as follows: |
---|
28 | | - | “(g-1)(1) A grant may be made to a qualified taxpayer under subsection (e)(1) of this |
---|
29 | | - | section who owns a unit in a multifamily common interest community, as defined in section |
---|
30 | | - | 2232(3) of the Common Interest Community Repairs Amendment Act of 2018, effective October |
---|
31 | | - | 30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-168, D.C. Official Code § 42-2071(3)) (“Common Interest Community |
---|
32 | | - | Repairs Amendment Act”), located in Square 2594, for the cost of rehabilitation by the common |
---|
33 | | - | interest community attributable to the taxpayer. |
---|
34 | | - | “(2) The Mayor shall ensure that all funds granted to a taxpayer who owns a unit |
---|
35 | | - | in a common interest community are used to pay for the approved rehabilitation work. |
---|
36 | | - | “(3) If the grant is to be used for the cost of rehabilitation to common elements, as |
---|
37 | | - | defined in section 2232(2) of the Common Interest Community Repairs Amendment Act, the |
---|
38 | | - | preservation covenant required under subsection (i) of this section must be entered into by the |
---|
39 | | - | unit owners’ association or, if applicable, the master association.”. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 3. Applicability. |
---|
42 | | - | This act shall apply as of August 5, 2021. |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
54 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
55 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
56 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
57 | | - | |
---|
58 | | - | Sec. 5. Effective date. |
---|
59 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
60 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
61 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
62 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
63 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Chairman |
---|
69 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Mayor |
---|
76 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
78 | | - | |
---|
79 | | - | |
---|
| 38 | + | “(2) The Mayor shall ensure that all funds granted to a taxpayer who owns a unit 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | in a common interest community are used to pay for the approved rehabilitation work. 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | “(3) If the grant is to be used for the cost of rehabilitation to common elements, as 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | defined in section 2232(2) of the Common Interest Community Repairs Amendment Act, the 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | preservation covenant required under subsection (i) of this section must be entered into by the 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | unit owners’ association or, if applicable, the master association.”. 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 3. Applicability. 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | This act shall apply as of April 21, 2023. 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 45 |
---|
| 49 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | Sec. 5. Effective date. 47 |
---|
| 51 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 48 |
---|
| 52 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 49 |
---|
| 53 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 50 |
---|
| 54 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 51 |
---|
| 55 | + | D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 52 |
---|