District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0248 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/27/2023

                    1 
 
_______________________________ 	_______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Brianne Nadeau 	Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A BILL 8 
 9 
 10 
_________ 11 
 12 
 13 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 
 15 
__________________ 16 
 17 
 18 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of 19 
1978 to make certain multifamily residential structures eligible for historic homeowner 20 
grants. 21 
 22 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 
act may be cited as the “Targeted Historic Preservation Assistance Emergency Amendment Act 24 
of 2023”. 25 
 Sec. 2. Section 11b of the Historic Landmark and Historic District Protection Act of 26 
1978, effective March 2, 2007 (D.C. Law 16-	189; D.C. Official Code § 6-	1110.02), is amended 27 
by adding a new subsection (g-	1) to read as follows:  28 
 “(g-1)(1) A grant may be made to a qualified taxpayer under subsection (e)(1) of this 29 
section who owns a unit in a multifamily common interest community, as defined in section 30 
2232(3) of the Common Interest Community Repairs Amendment Act of 2018, effective October 31 
30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-	168, D.C. Official Code § 42-	2071(3)) (“Common Interest Community 32 
Repairs Amendment Act”), located in Square 2594, for the cost of rehabilitation by the common 33 
interest community attributable to the taxpayer. 34  2 
 
 “(2) The Mayor shall ensure that all funds granted to a taxpayer who owns a unit 35 
in a common interest community are used to pay for the approved rehabilitation work. 36 
 “(3) If the grant is to be used for the cost of rehabilitation to common elements, as 37 
defined in section 2232(2) of the Common Interest Community Repairs Amendment Act, the 38 
preservation covenant required under subsection (i) of this section must be entered into by the 39 
unit owners’ association or, if applicable, the master association.”. 40 
 Sec. 3. Applicability. 41 
 This act shall apply as of April 21, 2023. 42 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 43 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 44 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 45 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a).   46 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 47 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 48 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 49 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 50 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 51 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 52