Council | 09/29/2023 | Law L25-0041, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012874, Expires on Mar 29, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/06/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Act A25-0132 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009042 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0132 | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 05/16/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 05/05/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0255 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 05/01/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |