Council | 06/28/2024 | Law L25-0176, Effective from Jun 12, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007354 | ||
Council | 05/03/2024 | Act A25-0457 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005021 | ||
Council | 04/30/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 04/29/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/25/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0457 | ||
Council | 04/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 30, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Amendment (Mendelson) | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 02/12/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 02/08/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0298 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 09/20/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 08/25/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/17/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0298 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 05/26/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |