District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0298 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/02/2024

                             ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
_________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
 
 
To require the Office of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Questioning Affairs to 
research and produce a report documenting the Black LGBTQIA+ history of the District. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Black LGBTQIA+ History Preservation Establishment Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Black LGBTQIA+ history report.  
 (a) The Office of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Questioning Affairs 
(“Office”) shall research and produce a report on Black LGBTQIA+ history in the District. The 
report shall include:  
 (1) The history of the Black Pride Movement in the District and the notable 
people, places, and events that contribute to the rich history of the national and global queer 
culture;  
  (2) An analysis of the unique history of Black Trans people in the District and the 
contributions they have made to culture, activism, education, and other important spheres of life; 
 (3) The historical context of the AIDS Crisis, its effects on the Black LGBTQIA+ 
community in the District, and how policy choices impact the community to the present day; 
 (4) Curriculum recommendations for teaching Black LGBTQIA+ history in 
public schools in line with the Social Studies Standards for District of Columbia students; and  
 (5) Recommendations on how to promote the report to the public. 
 (b)  In developing the report, the Office shall consult individuals with lived experience or 
expertise on the topics covered and may provide compensation to those individuals for their time 
and contributions.  
 (c) The Office shall gather input for the report before final publication as follows:  
 (1) Hold a minimum of 2 public meetings; and 
 (2) At least 90 days prior to completing the report, shall publish a draft report and 
provide a 30-day public comment period. 
 (d) The Office shall submit the final report to the Mayor, the Council, the District of 
Columbia Archives, and the DC Public Library’s People’s Archives by May 1, 2025. 
 
 
   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
 Sec. 3. Advisory committee. 
 (a) There is established an Advisory Committee to provide guidance and feedback on the 
development of the report required by section 2. The Advisory Committee shall consist of 6 
members to be appointed as follows:  
 (1) One member from a Historically Black College or University located in the 
District, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, recommended by the Office; 
(2) Two members, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, appointed by the  
Chairman of the Council;  
 (3) Two members, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, appointed by the 
Mayor; and 
 (4) One member who is the Executive Director of the Commission on the Arts 
and Humanities, or his or her designee, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history. 
 (b) The Advisory Committee shall meet no more than once a month for up to 12 months 
to conduct its business and shall remain in effect until the completion of the report required by 
section 2.  
 (c) The Advisory Committee shall submit a final commentary summarizing its activities,  
recommendations, and any dissenting opinions to the Office, which shall be incorporated into the 
final report required by section 2. 
 
 Sec. 4. Advisory committee compensation. 
 (a) Section 1108(c-2) of the District of Columbia Government Comprehensive Merit 
Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. Official Code §1-
611.08(c-2)), is amended as follows:  
 (1) Paragraph (8) is amended by striking the period “.” and inserting a  
semi-colon in its place. 
 (2) A new paragraph (10) is added to read as follows:  
 “(10) Each member of the Advisory Committee appointed pursuant to section 3 of 
the Black LGBTQ History Preservation Establishment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading on 
April 2, 2024 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-298), may receive compensation in the form of a 
stipend of not more than $100 per meeting of the Advisory Committee, in accordance with 
standards the Mayor may establish by rulemaking.”. 
 (b) Expenses incurred by the Advisory Committee as a whole, or by an individual 
member when the expense was duly authorized by the Office, shall be reimbursed pursuant to 
section 1108(d) of the District of Columbia Government Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 
1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. Official Code § 1-611.08(d)). 
 
 Sec. 5. Applicability.  
 (a) This act shall apply upon the date of inclusion of its fiscal effect in an approved 
budget and financial plan.  
 (b) The Chief Financial Officer shall certify the date of the inclusion of the fiscal effect in 
an approved budget and financial plan and provide notice to the Budget Director of the Council   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	3 
of the certification. 
 (c)(1) The Budget Director shall cause the notice of the certification to be published in 
the District of Columbia Register.  
 (2) The date of publication of the notice of the certification shall not affect the 
applicability of this act. 
 
 Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 7. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia