District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0298 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/26/2023

                     
 
 
 
 
 
May 26, 2023  
 
Nyasha Smith, Secretary  
Council of the District of Columbia  
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Secretary Smith,  
 
Today, I am introducing the Black Queer History Commission Establishment Act of 2023. 
Please find enclosed a signed copy of the legislation, which is co-introduced by Councilmembers 
Charles Allen, Brianne K. Nadeau, Robert C. White, Jr, Kenyan R. McDuffie, Brooke Pinto, 
Matt Frumin, Janeese Lewis George, Christina Henderson, Trayon White, Sr., Vincent C. Gray, 
and Anita Bonds.  
 
This legislation seeks to establish a Black Queer History Commission to research and publish a 
report documenting the Black LGBTQIA+ history of the District of Columbia. This report would 
be housed in the DC Archives, and serve as a resource on the rich history of Black Queer 
contributions in the District. As the birthplace of Black Pride, the earliest and second largest 
Black LGBTQIA+ event in the world, DC is well-positioned to lead the way in collecting and 
preserving this important history. In doing so, our communities will also lead the way in building 
the future we want to see. As James Baldwin famously wrote, “History is not the past. It is the 
present. We carry our history with us. We are our history.”   
 Please contact my Legislative Director, Kendra Wiley, at kwiley@dccouncil.gov if you have 
any questions about this legislation. 
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
 
Zachary Parker  
Ward 5 Councilmember    
 
 
1 
 
 
______________________________                           _______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Charles Allen     Councilmember Zachary Parker 2 
 3 
 4 
_______________________________                          _______________________________ 5 
Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau      Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  6 
 7 
 8 
_______________________________                          ________________________________ 9 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie         Councilmember Brooke Pinto 10 
 11 
 12 
_______________________________                          ________________________________ 13 
Councilmember Matt Frumin          Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 14 
 15 
 16 
_______________________________     _______________________________ 17 
Councilmember Christina Henderson      Councilmember Trayon White, Sr.  18 
 19 
 20 
 21 
______________________________ _______________________________  22 
Councilmember Vincent C.  Gray     Councilmember Anita Bonds   23 
 24 
 25 
 26 
 27 
 28 
A BILL 29 
_________________________ 30 
 31 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 32 
 33 
_________________________ 34 
 35 
 36 
To establish the Black Queer History Commission to research and publish a report documenting 37 
the Black LGBTQIA+ history of the District. 38 
 39 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 40 
act may be cited as the “Black Queer History Commission Establishment Act of 2023”. 41 
 Sec. 2.  Establishment and purpose. 42   
 
 
2 
 
 
(a) There is established the Black Queer History Commission (“Commission”) to serve as 43 
a collaborative body to research, collect, develop, and archive Black LGBTQIA+ history, and to 44 
educate and promote knowledge of the history of the Black Pride Movement and the notable 45 
people, places, and events that contribute to the rich history of the national and global queer 46 
culture. 47 
(b) The purpose of the Commission will be to research, document, and archive Black 48 
LGBTQIA+ history in the District and produce a report to be housed in the District of Columbia 49 
Archives. The report shall include recommendations on how to educate the public on the 50 
contents in the report. 51 
(c)(1) The Commission shall be comprised of six voting members to be appointed as 52 
follows: 53 
 (A) One member from Howard University with expertise in Black 54 
LGBTQIA+ history; 55 
 (B) Two members appointed by Council; 56 
 (C) Two members appointed by the Mayor, with the advice and consent of 57 
the Council, pursuant to section 2(e) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 58 
(D.C. Law 2-141; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(3); and 59 
 (D) One member from the Commission on Arts; 60 
 (2) A majority of the sitting voting members shall constitute a quorum. 61 
 (3) All voting members shall have equal power to vote.  62 
 (4) The first meeting of the Commission shall occur no later than May 1, 2024. 63 
 (5) The Commission shall convene at least 12 times and meet at least once a 64 
month. 65   
 
 
3 
 
 
 (6) Subject to an appropriation for the purpose, members of the Commission shall 66 
be entitled to per diem compensation and reimbursement of expenses for up to 12 meetings.  67 
 (7) The Commission shall sunset on November 1, 2025, or after the report 68 
required by subsection (d) of this section has been published.  69 
 (d)(1) No later than 18 months after the effective date of this act the Commission shall 70 
publish and transmit to the Mayor and Council a report. 71 
 (2) The Commission shall gather input for the report as follows:  72 
 (A) Hold a minimum of 5 public meetings; and 73 
 (B) At least 90 days prior to completing the Report, the Commission shall 74 
publish a draft report and provide a 30-day public comment period. 75 
Sec. 3. Applicability.  76 
(a) Section 2(c)(6) shall apply upon the date of inclusion of its fiscal effect in an 77 
approved budget and financial plan.  78 
(b) The Chief Financial Officer shall certify the date of the inclusion of the fiscal effect in 79 
an approved budget and financial plan, and provide notice to the Budget Director of the Council 80 
of the certification. 81 
(c)(1) The Budget Director shall cause the notice of the certification to be published in 82 
the District of Columbia Register.  83 
(2) The date of publication of the notice of the certification shall not affect the 84 
applicability of this act. 85 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 86 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 87 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 88   
 
 
4 
 
 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 89 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 90 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 91 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 92 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 93 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 94 
Columbia Register. 95