| 4 | + | 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | ______________________________ 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | A BILL 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | _________ 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | __________________ 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, section 25-723 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | amend the hours of operation, sale, service, and consumption of alcoholic beverages for 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | on-premises retailers, manufacturers holding an on-site sales and consumption permit, 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | and temporary license holders during the 2023 Women’s World Cup. 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | act may be cited as the “2023 Women’s World Cup Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | Sec. 2. Section 25-723 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by adding a 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | new subsection (g) to read as follows: 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | “(g)(1) Except as provided in § 25-724, a licensee under an on-premises retailer’s license, 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | manufacturer’s license holding an on-site sales and consumption permit, or a temporary license, 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | may, during the Women’s World Cup Tournament, beginning on July 20, 2023, through August 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | 20, 2023, operate 24 hours a day and sell, serve, and allow for the consumption of alcoholic 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | beverages between the hours of 6:00 a.m. and 4:00 a.m. beginning on the first day of the 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | Women’s World Cup Tournament through the last day of the Women’s World Cup Tournament 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | if the licensee: 34 |
---|
| 37 | + | “(A) Registers with the Board; 35 2 |
---|
8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | _________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | __________________ |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | |
---|
18 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, section 25-723 of the District of Columbia Official Code to |
---|
19 | | - | amend the hours of operation, sale, service, and consumption of alcoholic beverages for |
---|
20 | | - | on-premises retailers, manufacturers holding an on-site sales and consumption permit, |
---|
21 | | - | and temporary license holders during the 2023 Women’s World Cup. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | act may be cited as the “2023 Women’s World Cup Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 25-723 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by adding a |
---|
27 | | - | new subsection (g) to read as follows: |
---|
28 | | - | “(g)(1) Except as provided in § 25-724, a licensee under an on-premises retailer’s license, |
---|
29 | | - | manufacturer’s license holding an on-site sales and consumption permit, or a temporary license, |
---|
30 | | - | may, during the Women’s World Cup Tournament, beginning on July 20, 2023, through August |
---|
31 | | - | 20, 2023, operate 24 hours a day and sell, serve, and allow for the consumption of alcoholic |
---|
32 | | - | beverages between the hours of 6:00 a.m. and 4:00 a.m. beginning on the first day of the |
---|
33 | | - | Women’s World Cup Tournament through the last day of the Women’s World Cup Tournament |
---|
34 | | - | if the licensee: |
---|
35 | | - | “(A) Registers with the Board; |
---|
36 | | - | “(B) Pays a registration fee of $100; and |
---|
37 | | - | “(C) Provides written notice no later than July 17, 2023, to the |
---|
38 | | - | Administration and the Metropolitan Police Department of its extended hours of operation, sales, |
---|
39 | | - | service, and consumption. |
---|
40 | | - | “(2) The fees collected pursuant to this subsection shall be deposited in the |
---|
41 | | - | Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration Fund established by § 25-210. |
---|
42 | | - | “(3) For the purposes of this subsection, the term “Women’s World Cup |
---|
43 | | - | Tournament” means the international soccer tournament that takes place every 4 years and is |
---|
44 | | - | organized by the Federation Internationale de Football Association. |
---|
45 | | - | “(4) This subsection shall expire on August 21, 2023.”. |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | |
---|
54 | | - | |
---|
55 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
56 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
57 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
58 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
59 | | - | |
---|
60 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
61 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
62 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
63 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
64 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
65 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Chairman |
---|
71 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | |
---|
75 | | - | |
---|
76 | | - | |
---|
77 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Mayor |
---|
79 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
80 | | - | |
---|
| 39 | + | “(B) Pays a registration fee of $100; and 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | “(C) Provides written notice no later than 3 calendar days before the first 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | day of the Women’s World Cup Tournament to the Board and the Metropolitan Police 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | Department of its extended hours of operation, sales, service, and consumption. 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | “(2) The fees collected pursuant to this subsection shall be deposited in the 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration Fund established by § 25-210. 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | “(3) For the purposes of this subsection, the term “Women’s World Cup 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | Tournament” means the international soccer tournament that takes place every 4 years and is 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | organized by the Federation Internationale de Football Association. 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | “(4) This subsection shall expire on August 21, 2023. 45 |
---|
| 49 | + | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 47 |
---|
| 51 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 48 |
---|
| 52 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 49 |
---|
| 53 | + | Sec. 4. Effective date. 50 |
---|
| 54 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 51 |
---|
| 55 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 52 |
---|
| 56 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 53 |
---|
| 57 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 54 |
---|
| 58 | + | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 55 |
---|