District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0302 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/06/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, section 25-723 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 
amend the hours of operation, sale, service, and consumption of alcoholic beverages for 
on-premises retailers, manufacturers holding an on-site sales and consumption permit, 
and temporary license holders during the 2023 Women’s World Cup.   
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “2023 Women’s World Cup Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 25-723 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by adding a 
new subsection (g) to read as follows:  
 “(g)(1) Except as provided in § 25-724, a licensee under an on-premises retailer’s license, 
manufacturer’s license holding an on-site sales and consumption permit, or a temporary license, 
may, during the Women’s World Cup Tournament, beginning on July 20, 2023, through August 
20, 2023, operate 24 hours a day and sell, serve, and allow for the consumption of alcoholic 
beverages between the hours of 6:00 a.m. and 4:00 a.m. beginning on the first day of the 
Women’s World Cup Tournament through the last day of the Women’s World Cup Tournament 
if the licensee: 
“(A) Registers with the Board; 
“(B) Pays a registration fee of $100; and 
“(C) Provides written notice no later than July 17, 2023, to the 
Administration and the Metropolitan Police Department of its extended hours of operation, sales, 
service, and consumption. 
 “(2) The fees collected pursuant to this subsection shall be deposited in the 
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration Fund established by § 25-210. 
 “(3) For the purposes of this subsection, the term “Women’s World Cup 
Tournament” means the international soccer tournament that takes place every 4 years and is 
organized by the Federation Internationale de Football Association. 
 “(4) This subsection shall expire on August 21, 2023.”. 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 
 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia