Council | 07/07/2023 | Act A25-0152 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009410, Expires on Sep 27, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/29/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/29/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0152, Expires on Sep 27, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/05/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |