District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0303 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
1+1
52
63 1
7-AN ACT
4+ ______________________________ 2
5+ Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3
6+ 4
7+ 5
8+ 6
9+A BILL 7
10+ 8
11+_________ 9
12+ 10
13+ 11
14+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12
15+ 13
16+__________________ 14
17+ 15
18+ 16
19+To amend, on an emergency basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 17
20+Initiative of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that 18
21+scored 150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration 19
22+application to the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application 20
23+period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be 21
24+considered for a manufacturer license. 22
25+ 23
26+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 24
27+act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment 25
28+Act of 2023”. 26
29+ Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 27
30+1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 28
31+amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows: 29
32+ “(y)(1) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis 30
33+facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 31
34+2022, that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer 32
35+license after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 33
36+Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 34 2
837
9-________
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-_______________________
14-
15-To amend, on an emergency basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment
16-Initiative of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that
17-scored 150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration
18-application to the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application
19-period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be
20-considered for a manufacturer license.
21-
22-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
23-act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment
24-Act of 2023”.
25- Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of
26-1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is
27-amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows:
28- “(y) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis facility
29-registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022,
30-that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer license
31-after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency
32-Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill
33-25-303); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC
34-Board by May 1, 2024.”.
35-
36-Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
37- The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
38-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
39-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
40-
41-
42-
43-
44-
45-
46- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
51- 2
52- Sec. 4. Effective date.
53- This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
54-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
55-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
56-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
57-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
58-
59-
60-
61-______________________________
62-Chairman
63-Council of the District of Columbia
64-
65-
66-
67-
68-_________________________________
69-Mayor
70-District of Columbia
71-
38+25-__); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC Board 35
39+by May 1, 2024. 36
40+Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 37
41+ The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 38
42+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 39
43+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 40
44+ Sec. 4. Effective date. 41
45+ This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 42
46+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 43
47+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 44
48+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 45
49+D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 46