District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0303 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/06/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________________ 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 
Initiative of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that 
scored 150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration 
application to the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application 
period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be 
considered for a manufacturer license.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment 
Act of 2023”. 
     Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 
1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 
amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows:  
   “(y) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis facility 
registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, 
that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer license 
after the effective date of the  Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 
25-303); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC 
Board by May 1, 2024.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
     The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
     
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
     This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia