Council | 10/20/2023 | Law L25-0061, Effective from Oct 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013727, Expires on May 17, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Act A25-0156 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009687 | ||
Council | 07/12/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0156 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0306 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/05/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |