Council | 02/16/2024 | Law L25-0109, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001657 | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 12/01/2023 | Act A25-0311 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015466 | ||
Council | 11/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0311 | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 09/28/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/26/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0312 | ||
Council | 09/11/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 07/13/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/16/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0312 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 06/02/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |