Council
|
06/28/2024
|
Law L25-0175, Effective from Jun 08, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007353
|
|
|
Council
|
03/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Congress
|
|
|
Council
|
03/15/2024
|
Act A25-0411 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002732
|
|
|
Council
|
03/12/2024
|
Returned from Mayor
|
|
|
Council
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0411
|
|
|
Council
|
03/11/2024
|
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 25, 2024
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Pinto Oral Amendment
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Final Reading
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment (McDuffie)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #4 (T. White)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #3 (T. White)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #2 - T. White
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (T. White)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #2 (L. George)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (L. George)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment (Nadeau)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #2 (T. White)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #3 (T. White)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #1 (T. White)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #4 (Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #3 (Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #2 (Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Amendment (Henderson)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #1 (Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment (Nadeau)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment (L.George #3)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Amendment (L.George #2)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment (L.George #1)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Oral Amendment (McDuffie)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Amendment (McDuffie and L.George)
|
|
|
Council
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee Report Filed
|
|
|
Council
|
01/17/2024
|
Committee Mark-up of B25-0345
|
|
|
Council
|
01/16/2024
|
Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
|
|
|
Council
|
09/18/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
09/01/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
08/24/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
07/11/2023
|
Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Council
|
06/30/2023
|
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0345 Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
06/21/2023
|
Introduced in Office of the Secretary
|
|
|