Council | 12/06/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 11/24/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0351 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 06/28/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |