District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0351 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/28/2023

                            Briann K. adeau 
Counclbni.'tlWc.t, Ward l 
oun il of the Di trict of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Rulldin, 
1350 Penn yl t1i, Avenue, NW 
W;t!<hlngton, D • 2000 
Statement of Introduction 
Sexual Harassment Investigation Integrity Amendment Act 
of 2023 
June 28, 2023 
Nyasha Smith, Secretary 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Secretary Smith, 
Recent allegations 
of serious sexual harassment at the highest levels 	of our government 
have harmed employees, called into question investigative procedures, and damaged public trust. 
As a Council, we have a responsibility to support victims, protect workers, and restore public 
trust by holding people accountable, especially people in positions 
of authority. 
Today I am introducing the "Sexual Harassment Investigation Integrity Amendment Act 
of 2023", along with Council Chairman Phil Mendelson and Councilmembers Christina 
Henderson, Robert White, Brooke Pinto, Janeese Lewis George, Zachary Parker, Charles Allen, 
Vincent Gray, and Anita Bonds. We have an opportunity to ensure that, going forward, 
employees who believe they have been subject 
to sexual harassment will have confidence that 	if 
they come forward, their cases will be handled professionally and without bias. 
This bill requires that allegations 
of sexual harassment made against executive branch 
employees in positions 
of power-specifically, mayoral appointees, including agency and sub­
agency heads, deputy mayors, and those appointed to boards and commissions -be referred 
to an 
independent investigator with experience in investigating sexual harassment allegations, rather 
than be handled by any office within the executive branch. 
I want to acknowledge how brave it was for these women to come forward and how 
difficult it must have been 
to share such horrible experiences. 	No employee should feel unsafe in 
their workplace. No employee should be subject to sexual harassment, especially by those in 
positions 
of authority and influence. No employee should fear retribution -or, just as bad, 
inaction -for coming forward. 
Employees should be able to trust that their allegations will be taken seriously, and that 
an investigation will not be influenced by internal or external politics or the appearance 
of  politics. The public should be able to trust that we are protecting employees, protecting the use 	of 
District government assets, and that government offices are focused on and capable 	of doing the 
work they are assigned in an environment and culture that supports that work. 
Requiring independent investigations 
is a significant part of restoring that trust. They will 
allow for unsafe environments and specific incidents 
to be identified earlier, create a disincentive 
to potential offenders, and give confidence 	to those who would file a complaint 	to do so to 
protect themselves and others, and to do so earlier. 
Last Council Period, after lengthy research and discussion, this body approved a sexual 
harassment policy for our own branch 
of government that requires independent investigations in 
cases 
of formal sexual harassment complaints. We also recognized that when complaints are 
made against those with the highest level 
of authority -councilmembers themselves -even 
greater attention must be paid to the uneven power dynamic, and we required that even informal 
complaints must go 
to an independent investigator. Executive branch employees deserve the 
same protections. 
Sincerely, 
Brianne K. Nadeau 
Councilmember, Ward 1 
Chairperson, Committee on Public Works & Operations 
2  ~Phil Mendelson 	Councilmember Brianne 	K. Nadeau 
Councilmember Brooke Pinto 	Councilmember Chnstina Henderson 
~r~ 
Councilmember J aneese Lewis George 
Councilmember Charles Allen 	Councilmember Robert 
C. White, Jr. 
Councilmember Anita Bonds 
A BILL 
IN THE COUNCIL OF 	THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To Amend the District of Columbia Human Rights Act 	of 1977 to establish investigatory 
2 procedures for harassment by certain District government employees. 
3 
4 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 
5 be cited as the "Sexual Harassment Investigation Integrity Amendment Act 
of 2023 ". 
1  6 Sec. 2. Section 303 of The District of Columbia Human Rights Act of 1977, effective 
7 December 13, 1977 (D.C. Law 2-38, D.C. Official 
Code§ 2-1401.01), is amended as follows: 
8 (a) Subsection (a) 
is amended to read as follows: 
9 "(a) Notwithstanding subsection (c) 
of this section, The Mayor shall establish rules 	of 
10 procedure for the investigation, conciliation, and hearing 	of administrative complaints filed 
11 against District government agencies, officials and employees alleging violations 	of this chapter. 
12 The final administrative determination in such matters shall 	be made by the Mayor or his 
13 designee." 
14 (b) A new subsection (c) 
is added to read as follows: 
15 "( c) (1) Investigations of a formal or informal complaint of harassment or other unlawful 
16 discriminatory practice by a District government employee shall be referred to the Inspector 
17 General if the alleged perpetrator, at the time 	of the alleged incident or at the time 	of the 
18 complaint, serves in one 	of the following capacities: 
19 	"(A) A mayoral appointee of any subordinate agency, board, or 
20 commission, as defined by the Confirmation 
Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
21 142; D.C. Official Code§ 1-523.01); 
22 	"(B) The Director 
of a non-subordinate agency; or, 
23 
"(C) Any Career, Educational, Legal, Excepted, 	or Management 
24 Supervisory Services employee who reports directly to the 
Mayor or City Administrator. 
25 	"(2) The Inspector General shall hire and retain independent counsel to conduct 
26 
prompt investigations into any complaints referred pursuant to paragraph 	(1 ), and to produce a 
27 report 
of findings. 
28 	"(A) Independent counsel hired and retained by the Inspector General 
2  29 pursuant to this subsection shall have experience in confidentiality and sexual harassment law, 
30 including litigation and mediation." 
31 	"(3) Investigations referred 	to the Inspector General, 	in addition to encompassing 
32 the direct scope 
of the complaint, shall include an assessment 	of whether any District 
33 government resources were expended in the course 	of any unlawful discriminatory practice, and 
34 whether workplace culture, management procedures, or other broader factors contributed 
to any 
35 unlawful discriminatory practice. 
36 Sec. 
3. Fiscal impact statement. 
37 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 
in the conm1ittee report as the fiscal 
38 impact statement required by section 4a 	of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 1975, 
39 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.
C. Official Code§ l-301.47a). 
40 Sec. 
4. Effective date. 
41 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor ( or in the event 	of veto by the 
42 Mayor, action by the Council 
to override the veto), a 30-day period 	of congressional review as 
43 provided in section 602(c)(l) 	of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
44 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official 
Code§ l-206.02(c)(l)), and publication in the District 	of 
45 Columbia Register. 
3