Council | 12/08/2023 | Law L25-0069, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015604, Expires on Jul 10, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/20/2023 | Act A25-0241 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013804 | ||
Council | 10/13/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 10/12/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/11/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0241 | ||
Council | 09/27/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 12, 2023 | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0358 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/05/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |