District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0382 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/19/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
 
 
To require, on an emergency basis, the Inspector General to hire outside counsel for the purposes 
of reviewing previous investigations of sexual harassment complaints against the former 
Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development and Chief of Staff to the Mayor  
and to produce a report of findings within 90 days.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  In Fiscal Year 2023 and subject to funding availability, the Inspector General 
shall hire and direct independent counsel to:   
 (1) Review investigations of complaints of sexual harassment and violations of 
Mayor’s Order 2017-313, effective December 18, 2017, against the Deputy Mayor for Planning 
and Economic Development and Chief of Staff to the Mayor as of January 1, 2023;  
 (2) Investigate other findings and items outside of the scope of prior 
investigations pursuant to paragraph (1) of this subsection, including hiring and promotion 
practices, workplace culture, and allegations of retaliation against complainants; and  
 (3) Review and make recommendations on sexual harassment complaint and 
investigation procedures of the District government. 
(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings and recommendations to the Mayor and 
Council no later than 90 days after the effective date of this act.  
(c) Independent counsel hired by the Inspector General pursuant to subsection (a) of this 
section shall have experience in confidentiality and sexual harassment law, including litigation 
and mediation.  
(d) Any subsequent formal or informal complaints received related to the individual  
investigated pursuant to subsection (a) of this section shall be investigated by independent 
counsel under the direction of the Inspector General.  
(e) The Inspector General may limit expenditures required to meet the requirements of 
this act to $450,000. 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
Sec. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of July 31, 2023. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register. 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia