Council | 07/28/2023 | Act A25-0174 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010356, Expires on Oct 18, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/20/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/20/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0174, Expires on Oct 18, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/18/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Amendment (Pinto) | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |