Council | 05/03/2024 | Law L25-0160, Effective from Apr 20, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005019 | ||
Council | 03/11/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Act A25-0409 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002307 | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0409 | ||
Council | 02/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 1, 2024 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/27/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/21/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 12/21/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0412 | ||
Council | 10/19/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/29/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/25/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0412 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |