District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0412 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/30/2023

                    June 30, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John 
A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504 
Washington, D.C. 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council 
of the District of Columbia is proposed 
legislation entitled the "Litter Control Amendment Act 
of 2023." 
This legislation would amend D.C. Official 
Code§ 8-803 to provide the Department of Public 
Works 
(DPW) the ability to serve a party cited for an infraction 	of the Litter Control 
Administration Act 
of 1985 with a Notice of Violation (NOV) via first-class mail. 	It would also 
provide that when such service 
is by first-class mail, 5 (five) additional days shall be added to the 
time period within which the party cited may or 
is required to take any action specified in the 
NOV. 
It also clarifies that a residential premises may be inspected and investigated for an alleged 
nuisance. The legislation would help remedy certain inconsistencies 
in current law and 
regulations regarding effective service 
of an NOV for violations of the Litter Control 
Administration Act and the ability 
of DPW to successfully file a case with the Office 	of 
Administrative Hearings (OAH) for such a violation. 
If you have any questions on this matter, please contact Timothy 	W. Spriggs, Director, 
Department 
of Public Works, at (202)-673-6833. 
Sincerely,  I 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
A 
BILL 
1rman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To amend the Litter Control Administration Act 	of 1985 to authorize service of a notice of 
violation by first-class mail to a person alleged to have created a nuisance 	or to the owner 
of the premises and to clarify that a residential premises 	may be inspected and 
investigated for 
an alleged nuisance. 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act 
may be cited as the "Litter Control Amendment Act of 2023". 
Sec. 
2. Section 4 of the Litter Control Administration 	Act of 1985, effective March 25, 
1986 (D.C. 
Law 6-100; D.C. Official Code§ 8-803), is amended as follows: 
( a) Subsection (b) is 
amended by striking the word "nonresidential" and inserting the 
phrase "residential 
or nonresidential" in its place. 
(b) Subsection (c)(2) 
is amended as follows: 
( 
1) The existing text is designated as subparagraph (A). 
(2) 
The newly designated subparagraph (A) is 	amended by: 
(i) Striking the phrase 
"the person responsible" and inserting the phrase 	"a 
person responsible" in its place; and 
(ii) Striking the phrase this subsection." and inserting the phrase "this 
subsection; or" in its place. 
(3) A 
new subparagraph (B) is added to read as follows:  "(B) As an alternative to the process described in subparagraph (A) of this 
2 paragraph, the Mayor may deliver the notice 
of violation by first-class mail to the owner 	of the 
3 premises or 
to a person responsible for the nuisance. When service 	is by first-class mail, 5 
4 additional days shall be added 
to the time period within which the premises owner or person 
5 responsible for the nuisance may, or 
is required to, take any action specified 	in the notice.". 
6 Sec. 
3. Fiscal impact statement. 
7 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 
in the committee report as the fiscal 
8 impact statement required by section 4a 
of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 1975, 
9 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 
Code§ 1-301.47a). 
10 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
11 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or 	in the event of veto by 
12 Mayor, action by the Council to ovenide the veto), a 30-day period 	of congressional review as 
13 provided in section 602( c )(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
14 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official 	Code§ l-206.02(c)(l)), and publication in the District 	of 
15 Columbia Register. 
2  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 
BIUAN L. SCHWALB 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
LEGAL 
COUNSEL DIVISION 
MEMORANDUM 
TO: Tommy Wells 
Director 
*** 
Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs 
FROM: Megan D. Browder 
Deputy Attorney General 
Legal Counsel Division 
DATE: April 21, 2023 
PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL 
ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION 
SUBJECT: Legal Sufficiency Review -	Draft "Litter Control Notice of Violation Service 
Amendment Act of 2023" 
(AE-23-164) 
This is to Certify that 	this Office has reviewed the above-referenced 	draft 
legislation and found it to be legally sufficient. If you have any questions in this regard, please do 
not hesitate to call me 
at (202) 724-5524. 
Megan 
D. Browder 
3  Glen Lee 
Chief Financial Officer 
MEMORANDUM 
TO: 
FROM: 
DATE: 
SUBJECT: 
REFERENCE: 
Conclusion 
Government of the District of Columbia 
Office of the Chief Financial Officer 
* * * 
May 24, 2023 
Fiscal Impact Statement-Litter Control Notice of Violation Service 
Amendment Act of2023 
Draft Bill as provided to the Office of Revenue Analysis on April 21, 
2023 
Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2023 budget and proposed fiscal year 2024 through fiscal year 
2027 budget and financial plan to implement the bill. 
Background 
The Department of Public Works (DPW) Solid Waste Education and Enforcement Program (SWEEP) 
team educates District property owners and investigates solid waste, sanitation, and recycling 
complaints or other potential nuisance conditions. If the SWEEP team discovers a condition that 
requires action, it can issue a Notice of Violation (NOV) to the person who created the nuisance or to 
the property owner. DPW can personally serve the NOV, affix it to the premises, or send it to the 
person responsible or owner via certified mail.
1 
The bill authorizes DPW to also serve an NOV via first-class mail. If DPW 	chooses to serve the NOV 
via first-class mail, then DPW must give the recipient five additional days to take any action indicated 
on the NOV. 
1 Litter Control Administration Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-100; D.C. Official Code§ 8-
803). 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 203, Washington, DC 20004 (202)727-2476 
www.cfo.dc.gov  The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
FIS: "Litter Control Notice of Violation Service Amendment Act of 2023," Draft Bill as provided to the Office of 
Revenue Analysis on April 21, 2023 
Financial Plan Impact 
Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2023 budget and proposed fiscal year 2024 through fiscal year 
2027 budget and financial plan to implement the bill. DPW will, when appropriate, use first-class mail 
instead of certified mail. DPW's planned use of first-class mail could save 	the agency over $300,000 
annually 
depending on how many notices the agency sends using first-class rather than certified mail. 
Page 
2 of2