Council | 11/26/2024 | Amendment (R.White) | ||
Council | 11/26/2024 | Postponed to Postponed to Dec 3 | ||
Council | 11/20/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/06/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0418 | ||
Council | 11/04/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 03/18/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/22/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0418 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Housing | ||
Council | 07/07/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |