Council | 10/25/2024 | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 21, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/25/2024 | Act A25-0573 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 012816 | ||
Council | 10/21/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/18/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0573 | ||
Council | 10/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 23, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/12/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/12/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0424 | ||
Council | 07/10/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/04/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/14/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment | ||
Council | 07/21/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0424 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |