Council
|
05/03/2024
|
Law L25-0161, Effective from Apr 20, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005020
|
|
|
Council
|
03/11/2024
|
Transmitted to Congress
|
|
|
Council
|
03/08/2024
|
Act A25-0406 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002248
|
|
|
Council
|
02/29/2024
|
Returned from Mayor
|
|
|
Council
|
02/29/2024
|
Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0406
|
|
|
Council
|
02/14/2024
|
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 29, 2024
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Final Reading, CC
|
|
|
Council
|
01/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Council
|
01/09/2024
|
CM Allen - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute
|
|
|
Council
|
01/02/2024
|
Committee Report Filed
|
|
|
Council
|
12/06/2023
|
Committee Mark-up of B25-0425
|
|
|
Council
|
12/04/2023
|
Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
|
|
|
Council
|
11/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
10/13/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
10/10/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
10/04/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
09/19/2023
|
Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
|
|
|
Council
|
09/08/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
08/31/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
07/21/2023
|
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0425 Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
07/12/2023
|
Introduced in Office of the Secretary
|
|
|