Council | 01/05/2024 | Law L25-0092, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000007, Expires on Aug 01, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/06/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 11/03/2023 | Act A25-0261 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014439 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/30/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0261 | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2023 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0441 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |