Council | 10/20/2023 | Act A25-0240 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013802, Expires on Jan 09, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/12/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/11/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0240, Expires on Jan 09, 2024 | ||
Council | 09/27/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 12, 2023 | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |