District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0444 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+_______________________________ 1
2+Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
3+ 3
4+ 4
5+A BILL 5
6+________ 6
7+ 7
8+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8
9+______________________ 9
10+ 10
11+To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 11
12+voluntary agreements. 12
13+ 13
14+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 14
15+be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023” . 15
16+Sec. 2. T he Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6- 10; D.C. 16
17+Official Code § 42- 3501.01 et seq .)), is amended by adding a new section 215a to read as 17
18+follows: 18
19+"Sec. 215a. (a) Notwithstanding the requirements of section 215, tenants and housing 19
20+providers shall not enter into a voluntary agreement pursuant to section 215(a) for 1 year . 20
21+"(b) Subsection (a) of this section shall not affect any voluntary agreements that have 21
22+already been approved by the Rent Administrator pursuant to section 215(b) prior to the 22
23+applicability date of the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, passed on 23
24+2nd reading December 15, 2020 (enrolled version of Bill 23-878).". 24
25+Sec. 3. Applicability. 25
26+This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. 26
27+Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 27
28+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 28
29+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 29
30+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 30 2
231
3-
4-
5-1
6-
7-AN ACT
8-
9-________
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-______________________
14-
15-
16-To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on
17-voluntary agreements.
18-
19-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may
20-be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”.
21-
22-Sec. 2. Section 215a(a) of Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C.
23-Law 23-246; D.C. Official Code§ 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended striking the phrase “2 years
24-beginning on October 1, 2021” and inserting the phrase “one year beginning on October 1, 2023.
25-
26-Sec. 3. Applicability.
27-This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023.
28-
29-Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
30-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
31-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
32-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
33-
34-Sec. 5. Effective date.
35-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
36-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
37-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
38-
39-
40-
41-
42-
43-
44-
45- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
46-
47-
48-
49-2
50-
51-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
52-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
53-
54-
55-______________________________
56-Chairman
57-Council of the District of Columbia
58-
59-
60-
61-
62-
63-_________________________________
64-Mayor
65-District of Columbia
66-
67-
68-
32+Sec. 5. Effective date. 31
33+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 32
34+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 33
35+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 34
36+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 35
37+D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 36