Council | 01/05/2024 | Law L25-0094, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000009, Expires on Aug 01, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/06/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 11/03/2023 | Act A25-0263 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014450 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/26/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0263 | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2023 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0445 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |