7 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | ____________ |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | ______________________ |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on |
---|
16 | | - | voluntary agreements. |
---|
17 | | - | |
---|
18 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may |
---|
19 | | - | be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. |
---|
20 | | - | |
---|
21 | | - | Sec. 2.Section 215a(a) of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective March 16, 2021 |
---|
22 | | - | (D.C. Law 23-246; D.C. Official Code § 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “2 |
---|
23 | | - | years beginning on October 1, 2021” and inserting the phrase “one year beginning on October 1, |
---|
24 | | - | 2023” in its place. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 3. Applicability. |
---|
27 | | - | This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. |
---|
28 | | - | |
---|
29 | | - | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
30 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
31 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
32 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 5. Effective date. |
---|
35 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
36 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as |
---|
37 | | - | provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 7 | + | A BILL 1 |
---|
| 8 | + | 2 |
---|
| 9 | + | 24-445 3 |
---|
| 10 | + | 4 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 12 | + | 6 |
---|
| 13 | + | ______________________ 7 |
---|
| 14 | + | 8 |
---|
| 15 | + | To enact on a temporary basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 9 |
---|
| 16 | + | voluntary agreements. 10 |
---|
| 17 | + | 11 |
---|
| 18 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 12 |
---|
| 19 | + | be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. 13 |
---|
| 20 | + | Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-10; D.C. 14 |
---|
| 21 | + | Official Code § 42-3501.01 et seq.)), is amended by adding a new section 215a to read as 15 |
---|
| 22 | + | follows: 16 |
---|
| 23 | + | "Sec. 215a. (a) Notwithstanding the requirements of section 215, tenants and housing 17 |
---|
| 24 | + | providers shall not enter into a voluntary agreement pursuant to section 215(a) for 1 year. 18 |
---|
| 25 | + | "(b) Subsection (a) of this section shall not affect any voluntary agreements that have 19 |
---|
| 26 | + | already been approved by the Rent Administrator pursuant to section 215(b) prior to the 20 |
---|
| 27 | + | applicability date of the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, passed on 21 |
---|
| 28 | + | 2nd reading December 15, 2020 (enrolled version of Bill 23-878).". 22 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 3. Applicability. 23 |
---|
| 30 | + | This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. 24 |
---|
| 31 | + | 25 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|
51 | | - | December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the |
---|
52 | | - | District of Columbia Register. |
---|
53 | | - | (a) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having effect. |
---|
54 | | - | |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chairman |
---|
58 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
59 | | - | |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Mayor |
---|
65 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
| 37 | + | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 26 |
---|
| 38 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 27 |
---|
| 39 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 28 |
---|
| 40 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 29 |
---|
| 41 | + | Sec. 2. Effective date. 30 |
---|
| 42 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 31 |
---|
| 43 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 32 |
---|
| 44 | + | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 33 |
---|
| 45 | + | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 34 |
---|
| 46 | + | Columbia Register. 35 |
---|
| 47 | + | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having effect. 36 |
---|