District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0445 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 09/19/2023

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
A BILL 1 
 2 
24-445  3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
______________________ 7 
 8 
To enact on a temporary basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 9 
voluntary agreements.  10 
 11 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 12 
be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. 13 
Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-10; D.C. 14 
Official Code § 42-3501.01 et seq.)), is amended by adding a new section 215a to read as 15 
follows:  16 
"Sec. 215a. (a) Notwithstanding the requirements of section 215, tenants and housing 17 
providers shall not enter into a voluntary agreement pursuant to section 215(a) for 1 year.  18 
"(b) Subsection (a) of this section shall not affect any voluntary agreements that have 19 
already been approved by the Rent Administrator pursuant to section 215(b) prior to the 20 
applicability date of the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, passed on 21 
2nd reading December 15, 2020 (enrolled version of Bill 23-878).". 22 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 23 
This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. 24 
 25    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 26 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 27 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 28 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 29 
Sec. 2. Effective date. 30 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 31 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 32 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 33 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 34 
Columbia Register. 35 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having effect.  36