Council | 09/13/2024 | Law L25-0202, Effective from Aug 24, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010773 | ||
Council | 08/24/2024 | Law Number L25-0202 Effective from Aug 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/19/2024 | Act A25-0500 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 008364 | ||
Council | 07/15/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/11/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/10/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0500 | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 10, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Amendment (T.White) | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Amendment (Parker) | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Amendment (Nadeau) | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 03/19/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 03/18/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0469 | ||
Council | 03/12/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0469 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |