District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0469 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/18/2023

                     
OFFICE OF CHAIRMAN PHIL MENDELSON 
C O U N C I L OF T H E D I S T R I C T OF C O L U M B I A 
 
Statement of Introduction 
 
“Revised Project Labor Agreement Cost Threshold Amendment Act of 2023” 
 
 Today, I am introducing the Revised Project Labor Agreement Cost Threshold Amendment 
Act of 2023. This bill was first introduced in Council Period 24 and received a public hearing in 
November 2022. The legislation ensures labor peace and benefits District government construction 
projects. This bill would amend the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010 to revise the cost 
threshold for the required use of project labor agreements on construction contracts from $75 
million to $50 million.  
 
A project labor agreement (PLA) is an agreement with one or more labor organizations that 
establishes the terms and conditions of employment for a specific construction project. As a 
condition of being awarded a contract, the contractor must sign the negotiated PLA with any 
relevant union organizations. In return, labor strikes and similar disruptions are prohibited. This, 
in turn, ensures labor peace on high-cost government projects. 
 
 On February 4, 2022, President Joe Biden issued an Executive Order requiring PLAs on 
federal construction projects. The project cost threshold set by this Executive Order was $35 
million. In announcing the Order, the White House noted that the Order has the potential to affect 
$262 billion in federal government construction contracting and enhance job prospects for close 
to 200,000 workers. The new federal PLA requirement is also thought to alleviate coordination 
challenges on large, complex projects; raise quality standards for contractors bidding on federal 
projects; and reduce uncertainty in the contracting process by standardizing the work rules, 
compensation costs, and dispute settlement processes on construction projects. 
 
 In the District, a recent instance of the efficacy of PLAs is the new Frederick Douglass 
Memorial Bridge. The Douglass Bridge was the largest infrastructure project in the District’s 
history and was completed one month ahead of schedule. There are other examples of PLAs being 
beneficial and producing positive effects including Nationals Park, Audi Field, and the new 
Benjamin Banneker Academic High School. The Council last considered the issue of project labor 
agreement cost thresholds in the Procurement Integrity, Transparency, and Accountability 
Amendment Act of 2016. The fiscal impact statement for that legislation made an assumption that 
the District would receive bids on contracts with PLAs that are 10 percent higher than bids received 
without the PLA requirement. However, the capital budgets for the projects listed above were not 
increased due to PLAs, and in some cases (such as Audi Field and the Douglass Bridge) costs 
decreased after the PLA was negotiated. 
 
 PLAs are beneficial to the District. This legislation will expand the opportunity for the use 
of a mechanism that has already paid dividends for District residents, and has the potential to 
provide even more value. 
  1 
 
______________________________ 1 
 Chairman Phil Mendelson       2 
                  3 
 4 
            5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
 10 
 11 
To amend the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010 to decrease the cost threshold for the 12 
required use of project labor agreements on construction contracts from $75 million to 13 
$50 million. 14 
 15 
 16 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 17 
act may be cited as the “Revised Project Labor Agreement Cost Threshold Amendment Act of 18 
2023”. 19 
 Sec. 2 The Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 20 
18-371 § 606(a)(3); D.C. Official Code § 2-356.06(a)(3)), is amended by striking the phrase 21 
“$75 million” and inserting the phrase “$50 million” in its place. 22 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 23 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 24 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 25 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).    26 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 27 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 28 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 29 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 30 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 31 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 32