LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
B25-0500
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0500
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0500
Action History
Council
12/06/2023
Public Hearing Held
Council
10/27/2023
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Council
10/23/2023
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Council
10/06/2023
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0500 Published in the DC Register
Council
10/03/2023
Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services
Council
09/26/2023
Introduced in Office of the Secretary