District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0500 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 09/26/2023

                            COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA                 
The John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, nw 
Washington, D.C. 20004 
 
 	1 
 
Statement of Introduction 
Alternative Restorative Therapy Options for Youth Amendment Act of 2023 
September 26, 2023 
Today, I am introducing the Alternative Restorative Therapy (ART) Options for Youth 
Amendment Act, along with Councilmembers Janeese Lewis George, Charles Allen, Kenyan R. 
McDuffie, Brooke Pinto, Matthew Frumin, and Robert C. White, Jr.  
This bill would make a vital amendment to the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Act of 
1977 by requiring the Child and Family Services Agency (CFSA) to provide alternative forms of 
therapy to foster youth, including art therapy, music therapy, drama therapy, dance or movement 
therapy, and narrative therapy. While CFSA currently offers a broad array of therapy options for 
youth and families, most do not explicitly facilitate opportunities for youth to non-verbally and 
physically externalize their experiences in a therapeutic setting.  
CFSA-involved youth face unique challenges, ones which traditional talk-based therapies may 
not fully address. For example, many children and teens in the child welfare system may not 
want to verbalize, or may struggle to verbalize, their experiences and emotions due to trauma or 
difficult circumstances. Alternative therapies provide creative and nonverbal avenues for them to 
express their feelings and experiences.
1
 Alternative therapies also offer structured and safe 
outlets for youth to explore complex emotions. Young people can externalize their feelings, 
making it easier to discuss and reflect upon their experiences during therapy sessions. Alternative 
therapies are holistic, engaging different parts of the brain than traditional talk therapy, and allow 
youth to access and process emotions that may not be reached through traditional therapy options 
alone.
2
 The expressive processes involved in alternative therapies teach valuable coping 
strategies that extend beyond therapy sessions, aiding in stress management and facing life's 
challenges. Finally, alternative therapies can foster a strong therapeutic relationship between the 
youth and therapists, promoting trust and rapport through collaborative expressive endeavors.
3
 
Holistic and flexible approaches to therapy are essential for the well-being of CFSA-involved 
youth. While talk-based therapies remain an important tool, alternative therapies provide youth 
 
1
 Art Therapy with Children 
2
 The Helpfulness of Holistic Arts–Based Group Work with Children Living in Foster Care 
3
 Innovative and Brain-Friendly Strategies for Building a Therapeutic Alliance With Adolescents 
Christina Henderson 	Committee Member 
Councilmember, At-Large 	Hospital and Health Equity 
Chairperson, Committee on Health 	Judiciary and Public Safety 
 	Transportation and the Environment 
  COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA                 
The John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, nw 
Washington, D.C. 20004 
 
 	2 
with the opportunity to grow and heal without having to verbalize the narrative and effects of 
trauma. 
I look forward to working closely with Council colleagues to advance this legislation in the 
coming months. Together, we can ensure that foster youth in the District of Columbia receive the 
comprehensive care and support they need and deserve.   
 	1 
_____________________________           ___________________________ 1 
Councilmember Charles Allen  	Councilmember Christina Henderson   2 
  3 
 4 
_____________________________  ___________________________ 5 
Councilmember Janeese Lewis George   Councilmember Brooke Pinto  6 
 7 
 8 
_____________________________  ___________________________ 9 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie  Councilmember Matthew Frumin 10 
 11 
 12 
_____________________________ 13 
Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  14 
 15 
  16 
 A BILL     17 
  18 
_______________ 19 
  20 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 21 
  22 
_______________________ 23 
  24 
  25 
To amend the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Act of 1977 to require the Child and Family 26 
Services Agency to offer alternative forms of therapy to children in the custody of the 27 
agency. 28 
  29 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act 30 
may be cited as the “Alternative Restorative Therapy (ART) Options for Youth Amendment Act of 31 
2023”.  32 
Sec. 2. Section 303e(b) of the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Act of 1977, effective 33 
June 7, 2012 (D.C. Law 19-141; D.C. Official Code § 4-1303.03e(b)) is amended to read as 34 
follows:  35   
2  
  
“(b)(1) The Agency shall connect all children who are assessed as being in need of 36 
behavioral health care to an appropriate behavioral health service.  37 
(2) The Agency shall make available to children in the agency’s custody alternative 38 
forms of therapy, including: 39 
 “(A) Art therapy; 40 
 “(B) Music therapy; 41 
 “(C) Drama therapy; 42 
 “(D) Dance or Movement therapy; and 43 
 “(E) Narrative therapy.”. 44 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.  45 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal impact 46 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 47 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  48 
Sec. 4. Effective date.  49 
This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the Mayor, 50 
action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as provided in 51 
section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 52 
Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of Columbia 53 
Register.  54